+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 598
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper