+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 29, 2022: Senate Vote #742 ADOPTION
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 2