+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper