+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Engrossed
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 15, 2022: Senate Vote #664 ADOPTION OF CONSTITUTIONAL AMENDMENT BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor