+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 15, 2022: Senate Vote #670 ADOPTION
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor