+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor