+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 855
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2022: Senate Vote #831 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 50
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
April 1, 2022: House Vote #856 ADOPT
- Yeas: 145
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 31
March 15, 2022: Senate Vote #648 ADOPTION BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 51
- Absent: 5