+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor