+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper