+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper