+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper