+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Adopted
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper