+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper