+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 312
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor