+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper