+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper