+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 279
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper