+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 8, 2021: Senate Vote #180 ADOPTION BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor