+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2021: House Vote #287 ADOPT
- Yeas: 169
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 9
March 8, 2021: Senate Vote #170 ADOPTION OF CONSTITUTIONAL AMENDMENT
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor