+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 29, 2021: Senate Vote #359 CONSENT CALENDAR EXPRESSING THE WILL OF THE SENATE
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7