+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor