+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Engrossed
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 8, 2021: Senate Vote #155 MOTION TO ENGROSS: SB 213, SB 241, SR 100, SB 62, SB 69, SB 71, SB 72
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor