+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 159
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2021: House Vote #259 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 171
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
February 17, 2021: Senate Vote #52 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 50
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor