+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 642
- Effective Date
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2022: Senate Vote #756 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
March 28, 2022: House Vote #784 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 169
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 7
February 16, 2021: Senate Vote #44 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 50
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor