+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2021: House Vote #291 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 8
February 11, 2021: Senate Vote #37 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor