+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 178
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper