+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act 558
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper