+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 1, 2021: Senate Vote #97 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor