+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 266
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2021: Senate Vote #309 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 52
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
March 25, 2021: House Vote #304 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 167
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 9
March 1, 2021: Senate Vote #96 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 50
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor