+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 57
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper