+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 236
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
March 25, 2021: House Vote #301 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 158
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 12
March 5, 2021: Senate Vote #127 MOTION TO TABLE ALL BILLS ON THE RULES CALENDAR
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
March 5, 2021: Senate Vote #152 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor