+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor