+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 4
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Senate Sent to Governor
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
- House Second Readers
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper