+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 166
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Report Adopted
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed 146th, 115th, 159th
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed 56th, 52nd, 1st
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Insisted
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (5)
March 31, 2021: House Vote #421 Adopt CCR
- Yeas: 146
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 4
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #429 ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT
- Yeas: 52
- Absent: 4
March 25, 2021: House Vote #302 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 152
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 9
February 1, 2021: Senate Vote #14 MOTION TO ENGROSS
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 6
February 1, 2021: Senate Vote #15 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 51
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor