+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Lost
- Senate Third Read
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 2, 2023: Senate Vote #118 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 37
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor