+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Act 821
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
- Senate Third Read
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2022: House Vote #782 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 168
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 8
March 9, 2022: Senate Vote #604 PASSAGE AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 53
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor