+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 846
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2022: House Vote #830 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 154
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 13
March 15, 2022: Senate Vote #645 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor