+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 15, 2022: Senate Vote #669 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3