+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 231
- Effective Date
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper