+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
- Senate Insisted
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Insisted
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Engrossed
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2022: House Vote #861 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 169
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 8
March 15, 2022: Senate Vote #647 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 50
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor