+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Engrossed
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 15, 2022: Senate Vote #672 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor