+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 538
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor