+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper