+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 536
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper