+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 9, 2022: Senate Vote #602 MOTION TO COMMIT
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6