+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 533
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor