+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Reconsidered
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Notice to Reconsider
- Senate Lost
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2022: Senate Vote #650 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2022: Senate Vote #594 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
March 4, 2022: Senate Vote #584 MOTION TO ENGROSS
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
March 4, 2022: Senate Vote #588 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor