+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 565
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Senate Sent to Governor
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Notice to Reconsider
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2022: House Vote #613 Immediately Transmit
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 68
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 12
March 4, 2022: House Vote #612 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 68
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 12
February 24, 2022: Senate Vote #542 MOTION TO TABLE
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2022: Senate Vote #543 ADOPTION OF AMENDMENT #1 BY THE SENATOR FROM THE 6TH
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2022: Senate Vote #544 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor