+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 243
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (7)
March 29, 2021: Senate Vote #307 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4
March 25, 2021: House Vote #309 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 71
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 12
March 25, 2021: House Vote #310 Reconsider
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 96
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 12
March 3, 2021: Senate Vote #106 MOTION TO TABLE ALL BILLS ON RULES CALENDAR
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 5
March 3, 2021: Senate Vote #114 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 3
March 3, 2021: Senate Vote #112 MOTION TO REMOVE FROM THE TABLE
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
March 3, 2021: Senate Vote #113 MOTION FOR THE PREVIOUS QUESTION
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor