+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 574
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2022: House Vote #580 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 155
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 11
February 15, 2022: Senate Vote #515 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor